MD HB12 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a specified definition of "public safety employee" to include a deputy sheriff in Baltimore County when performing duties directly related to courthouse security, prisoner transportation, service of warrants, personnel management, or other administrative duties for purposes of providing for enhanced compensation benefits under the Workers' Compensation Law for a compensable permanent partial disability of less than a specified number of weeks under specified circumstances; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Workers' Compensation - Baltimore County Deputy Sheriff
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (123-14) (Y: 123 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-11) (Y: 126 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-11) (Y: 126 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-13 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-14) |
2015-04-13 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-0) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {877673/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-11) |
2015-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {963499/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2015-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2014-11-06 | House | Pre-filed |