MD HB1196 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 443
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing an exemption for certain check cashing services from provisions of law governing the licensure of check cashing services; authorizing a person to provide check cashing services without obtaining a certain license by registering each year with the Commissioner of Financial Regulation; requiring a person to obtain and maintain a certain identifier to register as a check cashing service; requiring a person to provide the Commissioner with certain information to register as a check cashing service; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Registration and Dissemination of Information

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 443
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-17SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2020-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {883799/1 Adopted
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB939 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 444

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Financial Institutions12102(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions12105(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions12105.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Financial Institutions12118(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback