MD HB1194 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 590
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 590
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from parking certain vehicles in the Town of Sharpsburg, Washington County, subject to a certain exception.
Title
Town of Sharpsburg - Parking of Vehicles - Restrictions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 590 |
2023-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-02-20 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Boundaries
Fines
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Parking
Penalties and Sentences
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Washington County
Zoning and Planning
Fines
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Parking
Penalties and Sentences
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Washington County
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 1011 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |