MD HB1194 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a local school system from charging a student a fee for enrollment in a summer school course if the student attends a school in the local school system, credit for the course is a high school graduation requirement, and the student has previously taken the course, but did not successfully complete or receive credit for the course.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Schools - Fees for Summer School Courses - Prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2020-03-11HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments {695161/1 Adopted
2020-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-11HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education7211(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback