MD HB1194 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to establish a Natural Resources Protection Program through a contractual relationship with a third-party organization to provide rewards of financial compensation to individuals and nonprofit organizations that report violations of natural resources and conservation laws; providing the purpose of the program is to augment law enforcement activities for State parks, waters, forest, and land; requiring the Department and the third-party organization to submit a certain annual report by October 1; etc.
Title
Natural Resources Protection Program of 2019
Sponsors
Del. Brooke Lierman [D] | Del. James Gilchrist [D] | Sen. Shelly Hettleman [D] | Del. Stephen Lafferty [D] |
Del. Robbyn Lewis [D] | Del. Pat Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {800017/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Advertising
Animals
Budgets
Circuit Courts
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Conservation
Counties
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Data
District Courts
Environmental Matters
Fines
Forests and Parks
Hunting and Fishing
Interest
Investments
Law Enforcement
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Ombudsmen
Records
Reports
Restitution
Revenue and Taxes
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Treasurers
Water
Work, Labor and Employment
Animals
Budgets
Circuit Courts
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Conservation
Counties
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Data
District Courts
Environmental Matters
Fines
Forests and Parks
Hunting and Fishing
Interest
Investments
Law Enforcement
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Ombudsmen
Records
Reports
Restitution
Revenue and Taxes
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Treasurers
Water
Work, Labor and Employment