MD HB1194 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to establish a Natural Resources Protection Program through a contractual relationship with a third-party organization to provide rewards of financial compensation to individuals and nonprofit organizations that report violations of natural resources and conservation laws; providing the purpose of the program is to augment law enforcement activities for State parks, waters, forest, and land; requiring the Department and the third-party organization to submit a certain annual report by October 1; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Resources Protection Program of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {800017/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback