MD HB1194 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 79-10)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Favorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Drug Cost Commission to determine how to make prescription drugs more affordable for State residents, State and local government, commercial health plans and other stakeholders within the State; requiring the Commission to create an advisory council; requiring the Commission to provide public notice of each meeting, make certain materials available to the public and provide an opportunity for public comment; requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations by January 1, 2019; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health – Drug Cost Commission

Sponsors

Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Bilal Ali [D]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]
Del. Ben Barnes [D]Del. Darryl Barnes [D]Del. Erek Barron [D]Del. Kumar Barve [D]
Del. Pamela Beidle [D]Del. Talmadge Branch [D]Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]Del. Ned Carey [D]
Del. Alfred Carr [D]Del. Mark Chang [D]Del. Luke Clippinger [D]Del. Frank Conaway [D]
Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]Del. Dereck Davis [D]Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]
Del. Diana Fennell [D]Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]Del. Barbara Frush [D]Del. Tawanna Gaines [D]
Del. Angela Gibson [D]Del. James Gilchrist [D]Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]Del. Ana Gutierrez [D]
Del. Antonio Hayes [D]Del. Keith Haynes [D]Del. Anne Healey [D]Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]
Del. Terri Hill [D]Del. Sheila Hixson [D]Del. Carolyn Howard [D]Del. Richard Impallaria [R]
Del. Michael Jackson [D]Del. Jay Jalisi [D]Del. Adrienne Jones [D]Del. Anne Kaiser [D]
Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. Benjamin Kramer [D]Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]Del. Clarence Lam [D]
Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]Del. Eric Luedtke [D]
Del. Patrick McDonough [R]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. Aruna Miller [D]Del. David Moon [D]
Del. Marice Morales [D]Del. Dan Morhaim [D]Del. Nick Mosby [D]Del. Edith Patterson [D]
Del. Andrew Platt [D]Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]
Del. Shane Robinson [D]Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]Del. Carlos Sanchez [D]
Del. Dana Stein [D]Del. Charles Sydnor [D]Del. James Tarlau [D]Del. Frank Turner [D]
Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]Del. Joseph Vallario [D]Del. Jeff Waldstreicher [D]
Del. Jay Walker [D]Del. Alonzo Washington [D]Del. Mary Washington [D]Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]
Del. C.T. Wilson [D]Del. Karen Young [D]Del. Pat Young [D]Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]
Del. Eric Bromwell [D]Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R]Del. Susan Krebs [R]Del. Ric Metzgar [R]
Del. Christian Miele [R]Del. Matt Morgan [R]Del. Sid Saab [R]Del. Kathy Szeliga [R]
Del. Chris West [R]

Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-04-09SenateHearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-04-09SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-04-06SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2018-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (135-2)
2018-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {176889/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-06HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback