MD HB1193 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a disciplinary panel to dismiss certain complaints against licensed physicians if either of two peer review reports makes a certain finding that a certain violation did not occur; authorizing a disciplinary panel of the State Board of Physicians to issue a certain letter of admonishment to certain licensees; requiring the Board to expunge all records of a public reprimand or probation 3 years after the final disposition of the case; providing certain insurers may not take any adverse actions under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Physicians – Discipline – Procedures and Effects
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] | Del. Dan Morhaim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-07 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2018-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agents and Brokers
Committees and Commissions
Discipline
Evidence
Expungement
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Insurance - Other than Health
Licenses
Notices
Physicians
Privacy
Public Health
Records
Reports
Review Boards
Agents and Brokers
Committees and Commissions
Discipline
Evidence
Expungement
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Insurance - Other than Health
Licenses
Notices
Physicians
Privacy
Public Health
Records
Reports
Review Boards