MD HB1191 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified raw foods and packaged foods that are entirely or partially produced with genetic engineering to display a specified label beginning on July 1, 2015; requiring a manufacturer to include a specified label on specified foods; requiring a supplier to include a specified label on a container used for packaging, holding, or transporting specified foods; requiring a retailer to place a specified label on a shelf or bin containing specified foods; etc.
Title
Health - General - Genetically Engineered Food - Labeling Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-10 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Agriculture
Attorney General
Attorneys' Fees
Business Regulation and Occupations
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Courts
Damages
Environmental Health
Food
Genetics
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Industry and Technology
Labeling
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Signs and Billboards
Attorney General
Attorneys' Fees
Business Regulation and Occupations
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Courts
Damages
Environmental Health
Food
Genetics
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Industry and Technology
Labeling
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Signs and Billboards