MD HB1190 | 2024 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB386

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting, beginning June 1, 2025, a person from selling a pesticide that has PFAS chemicals listed as an active ingredient on the labeling accompanying the pesticide; and prohibiting, beginning December 31, 2025, a person from using a pesticide that has PFAS chemicals listed as an active ingredient on the labeling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pesticides - PFAS Chemicals - Prohibitions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-12HouseHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2024-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

HB1190 (Carry Over) 2024-02-12 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Agriculture5101(n/a)See Bill Text
Agriculture5201(n/a)See Bill Text
Agriculture5210.6(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback