MD HB1190 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Executive Director of the Family Investment Administration in the Department of Human Resources to perform a specified weighted caseload analysis on or before July 1, 2017; requiring the Executive Director and the Secretary of Human Resources to use the results of the analysis for a specified purpose and to annually review caseloads and reallocate personnel as necessary based on the results of the analysis; etc.
Title
Human Services - Family Investment Administration - Weighted Caseload Analysis
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn |
2016-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Human Resources, Department of
Reports
Social Services - Generally
State Government - Personnel
Welfare
Work, Labor and Employment
Reports
Social Services - Generally
State Government - Personnel
Welfare
Work, Labor and Employment