MD HB1190 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the Child in Need of Supervision Pilot Program by requiring the Secretary of Juvenile Services to include Cecil County, Montgomery County, and Prince George's County in the Pilot Program; authorizing the Governor to include a $250,000 general fund appropriation in the budget bill for fiscal year 2013 to be provided as grants to Cecil County, Montgomery County, and Prince George's County to implement the expansion of the Pilot Program; altering a definition; etc.
Title
Child in Need of Supervision Pilot Program - Expansion
Sponsors
Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Aisha Braveboy [D] | Del. Emmett Burns [D] |
Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Del. Bonnie Cullison [D] | Del. Adrienne Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-04-06 | Special Order until later today (Senator Pipkin) Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Special Order until later today (Senator Gladden) Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-04-08 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (135-1) | |
2011-03-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2011-03-01 | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | Re-referred Judiciary | |
2011-02-17 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Cecil County
Community Facilities and Services
Grants
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Services, Department of
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Reports
Social Workers
Cecil County
Community Facilities and Services
Grants
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Services, Department of
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Reports
Social Workers