MD HB1189 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Reauthorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to grant, by law, a certain property tax credit against the property tax imposed on certain newly constructed dwellings in Baltimore City, subject to certain limitations; expanding the tax credit program to authorize the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to grant, by law, the property tax credit to certain owners of certain substantially rehabilitated dwellings; providing that the property tax credit may not be granted on or after July 1, 2025; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Newly Constructed Dwellings - Reauthorization and Modification

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB63 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 509

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - Property9304(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback