MD HB1188 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a child who is a juvenile placed in the custody of certain entities from being disenrolled from public school until the disposition of the child's juvenile case; requiring the public school in which the child who is a juvenile is enrolled to provide the State Department of Education with certain educational materials; requiring the Department in consultation with county boards of education to develop and implement a procedure to transfer to certain entities a copy of certain educational records; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Schools - Enrollment Location - Continuity

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2020-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {965564/1 Adopted
2020-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-11HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education7101(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback