MD HB1187 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB649
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the amount of income tax revenue from corporations that is distributed to a certain fund each year; and altering, beginning in fiscal year 2020, the amounts of capital grants calculated based on highway user revenues that are required to be to Baltimore City, counties, and municipalities.
Title
Transportation – Highway User Revenues – Revenue and Distribution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {943325/1 Adopted |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2022-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {803823/1 Adopted |
2022-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-15 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB726 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-11 - Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
HB649 (Carry Over) 2021-01-26 - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
HB649 (Carry Over) 2021-01-26 - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Corporations
Counties
Grants
Highways
Income Tax
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Baltimore City
Corporations
Counties
Grants
Highways
Income Tax
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 2 | 614 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 8 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 8 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |