MD HB1187 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a Class BA (bowling alley) license in Harford County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Harford County to issue the license to an owner of a bowling alley entitling the holder to sell beer and wine for on- and off-premises consumption and liquor for on-premises consumption; authorizing the license holder to offer daily on-premises wine tasting; providing that a bowling alley for which the license is issued is subject to certain alcohol awareness training; providing an annual license fee of $3,000; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Bowling Alley License

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-06SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-05HouseThird Reading Passed (137-1)
2020-02-28HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-02-24HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB381 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-13 - Referred Economic Matters

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Alcoholic Beverages221001.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages22102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages222004(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback