MD HB1187 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Baltimore Police Department Internal Affairs Unit in the Department of State Police; providing for the appointment and salary of a Director of the Unit; requiring the Director to take certain actions; requiring the Unit to perform certain duties; establishing that the offices of the Unit may not be located in Baltimore City; prohibiting the Baltimore Police Department from operating a division that performs the functions of the Unit as described in the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety - Baltimore Police Department Internal Affairs Unit

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25HouseUnfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
2019-02-19HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback