MD HB1185 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each State or private psychiatric hospital that provides subacute care to patients in a unit within the hospital that is licensed as a limited private inpatient facility to provide patients receiving care in the unit with an itemized bill that is consistent with billing standards required by insurance carriers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Psychiatric Hospitals - Units Licensed as Limited Private Inpatient Facilities - Billing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2020-02-28HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-14HouseHearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General191813(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback