MD HB1183 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 548
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 548
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the graduate social worker license issued by the State Board of Social Work Examiners to be the master social worker license; requiring a specified licensed bachelor social worker or licensed master social worker to submit specified information to the Board to obtain approval by the Board to engage in independent practice; authorizing the Board to reject an application for independent practice if the applicant has not completed the specified supervised experience required; etc.
Title
State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 548 |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2017-04-10 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Floor Amendment {573421/1 (Senator Nathan-Pulliam) Adopted |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {994131/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2017-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {416785/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Criminal Background Investigations
Disclosure
Health Occupations
Higher Education
Job Training
Licenses
Mental and Behavioral Health
Names
Records
Review Boards
Rules and Regulations
Social Workers
Substance Abuse
Criminal Background Investigations
Disclosure
Health Occupations
Higher Education
Job Training
Licenses
Mental and Behavioral Health
Names
Records
Review Boards
Rules and Regulations
Social Workers
Substance Abuse