MD HB1181 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 440
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering and expanding certain data collection and reporting responsibilities of the State Department of Assessments and Taxation concerning tax sales; requiring each county to provide the Department with certain information on the form the Department provides; requiring the Department to obtain certain data concerning certain categories of properties that are subject to tax sale through a certain annual survey; requiring the Department to obtain certain information concerning each county's tax sale process; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax - Tax Sales - Data Collection

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 440
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-16SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-03-10SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2020-03-09HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {585062/1 Adopted
2020-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - Property14879(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property14880(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback