MD HB1181 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing, instead of requiring, a certain appointing authority to interview a certain disabled veteran for certain State positions under certain circumstances.
Title
State Personnel - Disabled Veterans - Interviews for Noncompetitive Appointment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156 |
2018-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Reassigned to Finance |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {374562/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m. |
2018-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |