MD HB1181 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing, instead of requiring, a certain appointing authority to interview a certain disabled veteran for certain State positions under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Personnel - Disabled Veterans - Interviews for Noncompetitive Appointment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 156
2018-04-09HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-04-06SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-06SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-06SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-04-04SenateHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-20SenateReassigned to Finance
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2018-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {374562/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2018-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.
2018-02-14HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback