MD HB1179 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a motor scooter or moped dealer to apply to the Motor Vehicle Administration for the issuance of special dealer decals; authorizing a motor scooter or moped dealer that attaches a special dealer decal to specified motor scooters or mopeds to, as authorized by law, drive the motor scooters or mopeds on a highway or allow, for demonstration purposes, a prospective buyer to drive the motor scooters or mopeds on a highway; requiring a special dealer decal to be manufactured in a specified manner; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Special Dealer Decals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {398073/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2013-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Fees
Highways
Mopeds
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motorcycles and Motor Scooters
Signs and Billboards
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Highways
Mopeds
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motorcycles and Motor Scooters
Signs and Billboards
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration