MD HB1178 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a lien that is the result of unpaid property tax of the lessee of certain interests in property of certain governmental entities does attach, under certain circumstances, to certain property; etc.
Title
Property Tax - Liability for Payment of Tax on Leased Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313 |
2018-04-02 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Community Development
Counties
Federal Government
Leases and Rent
Liens
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Special Tax Districts
Taxes - Property
Community Development
Counties
Federal Government
Leases and Rent
Liens
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Special Tax Districts
Taxes - Property