MD HB1177 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 521
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Entering into the Interstate Anti-Doping and Drug Testing Standards Compact; providing the purpose of the Compact is to facilitate joint action to create more uniform and effective breed specific rules on the permitted and prohibited use of drugs and medications for the welfare of the horse; establishing the Interstate Anti-Doping and Drug Testing Standards Compact Commission to administer the Compact; providing for the composition, voting procedures, operation, and powers and duties of the Commission; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Horse Racing – Interstate Compact on Anti–Doping and Drug Testing Standards

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 521
2018-03-30HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-28SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-28SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2018-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-13HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-28HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback