MD HB1174 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 788
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 788
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State's Attorney of Calvert County to designate county attorneys or assistant county attorneys to prosecute civil infractions; and authorizing the designated attorneys to exercise the powers of the State's Attorney when prosecuting civil infractions.
Title
Calvert County - Civil Infractions - Prosecutorial Designations
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 788 |
2023-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2023-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2023-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 12 | 904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |