MD HB1174 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defining the term "marina" as it relates to the authority to remove a vessel under the State Boat Act to include all docks, ramps, mooring locations, and pump stations owned and operated by the Calvert County Board of County Commissioners.
Title
State Boat Act – Removal of Vessels From Marinas – Calvert County Board of County Commissioners Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-03-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-15 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Boats and Ships
Calvert County
Committees and Commissions
County Commissioners
Marinas
Natural Resources - Generally
Piers and Docks
Calvert County
Committees and Commissions
County Commissioners
Marinas
Natural Resources - Generally
Piers and Docks
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 8 | 721.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |