MD HB1174 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removing a certain requirement for a recipient to receive a Guaranteed Access Grant; requiring certain institutions of higher education to verify the annual family income eligibility of an applicant for a Guaranteed Access Grant using certain standards for verification; requiring the Financial Assistance Advisory Council in the Maryland Higher Education Commission to study and make certain recommendations and submit a certain report; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial Aid - Guaranteed Access Grants - Verification and Administration by Institutions of Higher Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseUnfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
2020-03-09HouseHearing canceled
2020-03-02HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-02HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education18303(n/a)See Bill Text
Education18303.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback