MD HB1173 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 729
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Calvert County, from time to time, to borrow not more than $26,453,345 to finance the construction, improvement, or development of certain public buildings, roads, and facilities in Calvert County, as herein defined, and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale at public or private sale of its general obligation bonds in like par amount; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 118 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 729
2021-04-10HousePassed Enrolled
2021-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed (118-15)
2021-04-10HouseMotion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Ghrist) Adopted
2021-04-08HouseMotion Special Order until 04/09 (Delegate Smith) Adopted
2021-04-08HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2021-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {329839/1 Adopted
2021-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2021-03-26SenateHearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-03-22SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2021-03-22HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2021-03-22HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-20HouseMotion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Belcastro) Adopted
2021-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {584267/1 Adopted
2021-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2021-02-11HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback