MD HB1169 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 436
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Health Services Cost Review Commission to establish a Community Benefit Reporting Workgroup; requiring the Commission to adopt certain regulations relating to the community health needs of nonprofit hospitals and reporting by nonprofit hospitals regarding community health needs and benefits provided by the hospital; requiring the Commission, on or before December 1, 2020, to issue a certain report to certain committees of the General Assembly; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Services Cost Review Commission – Community Benefits – Reporting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 436
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-15SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2020-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {826980/1 Adopted
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-14HouseHearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB774 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 437

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General19303(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback