MD HB1168 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 618
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 618
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering specified provisions of law concerning the authority of a municipality to establish a land bank authority; making specified provisions of law concerning the establishment of a land bank authority applicable to a municipality or county; authorizing two or more local governments to enter into an intergovernmental cooperation agreement; authorizing a governing body of a county or other taxing authority to transfer specified interest in property to an authority under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 618 |
2017-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2017-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {559536/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2017-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {710314/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Abandoned Property
Baltimore City
Banks and Trust Companies
Counties
Counties - Generally
Exemptions
Foreclosure
Insurance
Liens
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Real Property
Sewage
Tax Sales
Water
Baltimore City
Banks and Trust Companies
Counties
Counties - Generally
Exemptions
Foreclosure
Insurance
Liens
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Real Property
Sewage
Tax Sales
Water