MD HB1168 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 504
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that the amount of a credit against the State income tax is 50%, not to exceed $500,000, of the investment in a qualified Maryland cybersecurity company located in Allegany County, Dorchester County, Garrett County, or Somerset County; applying the Act to initial tax credit certificates issued after June 30, 2016; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cybersecurity Investment Tax Credit - Investment in Qualified Companies in Low-Income Areas

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-5) (Y: 133 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-6) (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-10HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 504
2016-04-11HousePassed Enrolled
2016-04-11HouseThird Reading Passed (133-5)
2016-04-11HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2016-04-11SenateSenators Madaleno, Edwards, and Ferguson
2016-04-11SenateConference Committee Appointed
2016-04-11SenateSenate Refuses to Recede
2016-04-11HouseDelegates M. Washington, Fennell, and Long
2016-04-11HouseConference Committee Appointed
2016-04-11HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2016-04-11HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2016-04-11SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2016-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments {989836/1 Report Adopted
2016-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2016-04-08SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2016-04-07SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2016-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (132-6)
2016-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed
2016-04-06HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2016-04-06HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2016-03-08HouseHearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-11HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1168&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb1168f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb1168t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb1168e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/Chapters_noln/CH_504_hb1168e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0008/hb1168_98983601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0008/hb1168.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb1168_w&m.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb1168_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1168,h-1049&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1168,s-1281&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1168,h-1486&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments

feedback