MD HB1168 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Public Service Commission from granting final approval for, and a person from undertaking, construction of a specified type of wind-powered generating station above specified heights within specified areas before July 1, 2015; providing that the Act may not be construed to affect any wind-powered generating station for which proceeds from a Maryland Water Quality Financing Administration loan have been paid to a manufacturer of wind-powered generating stations to initiate construction of the wind-powered generating station; etc.
Title
Electricity - Certificate - Wind Turbines - Limitation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-24) (Y: 100 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-16) (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until 4/4 (Colburn) Rejected (17-28) (Y: 17 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Raskin) {843828/1 Rejected (15-31) (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (112-22) (Y: 112 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Lafferty) Rejected (40-80) (Y: 40 N: 80 NV: 11 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-16) (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until 4/4 (Colburn) Rejected (17-28) (Y: 17 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Raskin) {843828/1 Rejected (15-31) (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (112-22) (Y: 112 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Lafferty) Rejected (40-80) (Y: 40 N: 80 NV: 11 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2014-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-24) |
2014-04-05 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (31-16) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Colburn) Rejected (17-28) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Raskin) {843828/1 Rejected (15-31) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {227472/1 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (112-22) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Lafferty) Rejected (40-80) |
2014-03-15 | House | Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Lafferty) {153328/1 |
2014-03-15 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate Lafferty) Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {623597/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2014-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alternative Energy Sources
Armed Forces
Construction
Economic and Community Development
Licenses
Power Plants
Public Service Commission
Sunset
Utility Regulation
Armed Forces
Construction
Economic and Community Development
Licenses
Power Plants
Public Service Commission
Sunset
Utility Regulation