MD HB1167 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to implement certain programs to provide certain discounted licenses, stamps, and permits to Maryland residents who meet certain criteria; authorizing the Department to issue certain complimentary licenses and permits to an out-of-state person who certifies that the person meets certain criteria if the person's state of residence extends similar privileges to a person meeting the same criteria; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hunting and Fishing Licenses - Discounts, Complimentary Licenses, and Reporting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
2020-02-21HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Chapter of the Acts2017(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources10301(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources10303(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources4604(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources4607(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources4745(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback