MD HB1167 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the use of a "motorized passenger scooter" on specified highways in the municipal boundaries of Ocean City under specified conditions; authorizing the State Highway Administration to prohibit the operation of a motorized passenger scooter on a bicycle way on specified highways under specified circumstances; defining terms; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Motorized Passenger Scooter - Use in Ocean City
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-04-06 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-09 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-04-08 | Re-referred Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-04-01 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2011-04-08 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (134-3) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-03-01 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | Re-referred Environmental Matters | |
2011-02-16 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles and Motor Scooters
Ocean City
Traffic Regulation
Highways
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles and Motor Scooters
Ocean City
Traffic Regulation