MD HB1166 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the establishment of certain law enforcement diversion programs subject to certain restrictions; authorizing certain individuals to participate in certain programs; authorizing certain providers to provide case management including certain approaches; requiring certain planning for the implementation of certain programs; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services to submit a report on the number of law enforcement encounters resulting in a behavioral health services referral; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety - Law Enforcement Diversion Programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {752815/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety41001(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback