MD HB1164 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the determination of when a vehicle is a salvage; altering the required contents of the statement an insurance company must provide when submitting an application for a salvage certificate; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to establish a vehicle value threshold for determining when a vehicle is a salvage; altering the criteria for when the Administration must issue a certificate of title for a vehicle that has been stolen and recovered; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance - Motor Vehicles - Salvage

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-16HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-26HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-18HouseReassigned to Environment and Transportation
2019-02-18HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-08HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback