MD HB1164 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the determination of when a vehicle is a salvage; altering the required contents of the statement an insurance company must provide when submitting an application for a salvage certificate; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to establish a vehicle value threshold for determining when a vehicle is a salvage; altering the criteria for when the Administration must issue a certificate of title for a vehicle that has been stolen and recovered; etc.
Title
Insurance - Motor Vehicles - Salvage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-26 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-18 | House | Reassigned to Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-18 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicles
Prices
Transportation - Generally
Insurance - Other than Health
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicles
Prices
Transportation - Generally