MD HB1162 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Maryland Stadium Authority to review certain matters and make certain recommendations relating to the Hagerstown Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility; authorizing the Authority to acquire by certain means a Hagerstown Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility site or an interest in the site; requiring the Authority to transfer certain lease payments to the Hagerstown Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility Fund under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Economic Development – Maryland Stadium Authority – Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-15 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB926 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Subjects
Appropriations
Bonds
Budgets
Contracts
Economic and Community Development
General Assembly
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Stadium Authority
Bonds
Budgets
Contracts
Economic and Community Development
General Assembly
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Stadium Authority
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 613 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 618 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 620 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 625 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 628 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 646.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 657.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |