MD HB1162 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the requirement that the surviving spouse of a deceased disabled veteran be at least 65 years old to qualify for a certain exemption to vehicle registration fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Registration – Exemption From Registration Fees – Surviving Spouses of Veterans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed (41-0) (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 157
2018-03-27HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-27SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-26SenateSecond Reading Passed (41-0)
2018-03-26SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-26SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-16HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback