MD HB1162 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $60,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Maryland Soccer Foundation, Inc. for the acquisition and installation of new lighting at the Discovery Sports Center, located in Germantown; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds; establishing a deadline for the encumbrance or expenditure of the loan proceeds; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Discovery Sports Center
Sponsors
Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Kathleen Dumais [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Del. Aruna Miller [D] |
Del. Kirill Reznik [D] | Del. Shane Robinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations | |
2011-03-02 | Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m. | |
2011-02-28 | Re-referred Appropriations | |
2011-02-16 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB1162.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb1162f.pdf |