MD HB1161 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 435
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 435
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a certain tax that a county or municipal corporation may impose on amounts paid for the rental, leasing, or use of any space, facility, or accommodation in a mobile home park or services provided by a mobile home park does not apply to certain mobile homes in Washington County; authorizing Washington County to impose, by ordinance, a tax on the use of a mobile home in the county; providing that the tax constitutes a lien on the mobile home and may be collected in the same manner property taxes may be collected; etc.
Title
Washington County - Mobile Home Tax - Authorization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 435 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Assessments
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Counties - Local Laws
Laws and Ordinances
Leases and Rent
Liens
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Penalties and Sentences
Property Tax
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local
Washington County
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Counties - Local Laws
Laws and Ordinances
Leases and Rent
Liens
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Penalties and Sentences
Property Tax
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local
Washington County
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 20 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 20 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 2 | 202.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |