MD HB1161 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Commerce to conduct a study on issues related to federal small business innovation research and technology transfer grants; and requiring the Department to report its findings and recommendations regarding funding options for grant recipients to the General Assembly by December 31, 2019; and terminating the Act after June 30, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Commerce – Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer – Study

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-04-08HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-08HouseFavorable with Amendments {245069/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-08HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-12HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback