MD HB1161 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing certain legislative findings and declarations; establishing the Uninsured Motorist Education and Enforcement Fund to provide funding for the education of drivers about the security requirements for motor vehicles in the State; establishing in the Uninsured Division a Program to Incentivize and Enable Uninsured Vehicle Owners to Be Insured to reduce the number of uninsured vehicles in the State; providing that an individual is eligible to participate in the Program under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured Motorists

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-28SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-28SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {823595/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2018-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback