MD HB1161 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a municipality to use revenue from a specified user fee on charges for the docking and storage of boats for land acquisition and the related construction and maintenance of public facilities to enhance public use and water access.
Title
Municipalities - Boat Docking and Storage - User Fees - Authorized Uses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-4) (Y: 132 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-4) (Y: 132 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135 |
2016-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-4) |
2016-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Boats and Ships
Fees
Marinas
Municipal Corporations
Piers and Docks
Public Buildings and Facilities
Revenue and Taxes
Storage
Fees
Marinas
Municipal Corporations
Piers and Docks
Public Buildings and Facilities
Revenue and Taxes
Storage