MD HB1160 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the authority of the juvenile court to notify specified school officials that a child has been found to be delinquent, in need of assistance, or in need of supervision and committed to a specified agency under specified circumstances; authorizing a court to notify specified school officials if a child found to be delinquent, in need of assistance, or in need of supervision is no longer committed to the custody of specified agencies; adding specified offenses to a specified list of offenses; etc.
Title
Safe Schools Act of 2010
Sponsors
Del. Michael Busch [D] | Del. Kathleen Dumais [D] | Del. James Gilchrist [D] | Del. Henry Heller [D] |
Del. Sheila Hixson [D] | Del. Jolene Ivey [D] | Del. Anne Kaiser [D] | Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-09 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Senators Conway, Pinsky, and Reilly | |
2010-04-09 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-09 | Senate Refuses to Recede | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2010-04-06 | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-06 | Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-10 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-22 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. (Education Health and Environmental Affairs) | |
2010-03-19 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs & Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-04-09 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2010-04-08 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-07 | Delegates Rice, Olszewski, and Ivey | |
2010-04-07 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-07 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2010-04-07 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-02-22 | Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-17 | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Administrative Office of the Courts
Arrests
Counties
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Expungement
Gangs
Human Resources, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Services, Department of
Law Enforcement
Notices
Privacy
Private Schools
Public Employees
Public Information
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
School Buses
Sexual Offenses
State`s Attorneys
Students
Teachers
Truancy
Victims
Administrative Office of the Courts
Arrests
Counties
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Expungement
Gangs
Human Resources, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Services, Department of
Law Enforcement
Notices
Privacy
Private Schools
Public Employees
Public Information
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
School Buses
Sexual Offenses
State`s Attorneys
Students
Teachers
Truancy
Victims