MD HB1159 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-10)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Secretary of Health to publish an annual report on the suicides of veterans and members currently serving in the armed services of the United States; limiting the information in the report to the age, sex, race or ethnicity, nature of service if known, and the method of suicide of the veteran or armed services member; requiring the report to include aggregate information for the lesser of the previous 5 years or the total number of years for which information is available; terminating the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health – Vital Statistics – Veteran and Armed Services Member Suicide Reporting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 154
2018-04-09HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-04-06SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-06SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-06SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-04-04SenateHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2018-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {136680/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-02HouseHearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback