MD HB1158 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a candidate who is defeated for the nomination for a public office from filing a certificate of candidacy as a write-in candidate at the next succeeding general election as a candidate for any office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Candidate Defeated in Primary Election - Write-In Candidacy in General Election Prohibited

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 121 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-09HouseThird Reading Passed (121-13)
2020-03-05HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-05HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB390 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 552

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Election Law10313(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law5303(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law5706(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback