MD HB1155 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 662
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 662
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a holder of a Class A alcoholic beverages license in Howard County to deliver alcoholic beverages in the county; requiring that an employee making deliveries be at least 21 years old; requiring an individual receiving an alcoholic beverages delivery to provide certain proof of age; providing for the manner in which an individual receiving a delivery of alcohol provides proof of age; requiring the Board of License Commissioners for Howard County to approve a certain certification; etc.
Title
Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages – Delivery Ho. Co. 01–21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 662 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-1) |
2021-03-12 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-05 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Age of Majority
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Crimes and Punishments
Delivery Services
Evidence
Howard County
Identification
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Crimes and Punishments
Delivery Services
Evidence
Howard County
Identification
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 23 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 23 | 1901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 23 | 1904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 4 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |