MD HB1155 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that a county or municipality is responsible for repairing or replacing a sidewalk that becomes damaged as a result of a tree planted by the county or municipality; and prohibiting a county or municipality from requiring a certain property owner to repair or replace, or contribute to the cost of repairing or replacing, a sidewalk that has become damaged as a result of a tree planted by the county or municipality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Governments - Responsibility for Repairing or Replacing Sidewalks

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-06HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
2020-03-03HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Local Government11314(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback